U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01834-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTIN DOMINGUEZ-RONDON, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 31, 2019: [Bond]
  • October 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 31, 2019: [Arrest]
  • October 30, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.