U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENSHAWE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 30, 2019: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.