U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00177
  • Case Name: VELICER et al v. LORELLI et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Response]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 03, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.