U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00175
  • Case Name: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF IRAQ TELECOM LIMITED FOR AN ORDER TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY FOR USE IN FOREIGN PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 FOR AN ORDER TO TAKE DISCOVERY FROM DECHERT LLP FOR USE IN FOREI et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Declaration]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Seal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum]
  • July 15, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 12, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2022: [Declaration]
  • July 01, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 01, 2022: [Intervene]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 17, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 01, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Costs]
  • November 23, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2021: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Filing Fee (Notice of Appeal)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 02, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 09, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Filing Fee (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Statement]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 22, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • January 14, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 12, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2021: [Stipulation and Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Stipulation and Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 24, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 06, 2019: [Exhibit]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Remark]
  • November 08, 2019: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.