U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01846-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COIT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • December 17, 2019: [Revoke]
  • December 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.