U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01856-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AL-WAZER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 08, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
  • November 08, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.