U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-01152
  • Case Name: CREATIVE LODGING SOLUTIONS, LLC v. G.W. PEOPLES CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Writ Issued]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Writ Issued]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 18, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Contempt]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)]
  • November 08, 2019: [Clerk's Entry of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.