U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FUQUAY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2019: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.