U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00178
  • Case Name: LUKIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Final Discipline Order]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 20, 2021: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Discovery Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Seal Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.