U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01910-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VAUGHAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order for Writ]
  • November 14, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.