U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01932-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHRISTOPHER ROUGHTON HOGG, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Permit]
  • March 09, 2021: [Permit]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Permit]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • December 02, 2020: [Modify]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order for Probation]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • February 24, 2020: [Modify]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 14, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 26, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2019: [Report and Order of Probation]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 22, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • November 21, 2019: [Report and Order of Probation]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice of US Passport]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2019: [Bond]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.