U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
  • January 24, 2020: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2019: [Probable Cause Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 25, 2019: [Probable Cause Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 20, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.