U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZAZUETA GARCIA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 19, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
  • December 11, 2019: [Expedite]
  • December 06, 2019: [Reconsideration]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Probable Cause Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2019: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.