U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • September 14, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • July 10, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • May 18, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • March 04, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • January 29, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • December 05, 2019: [Speedy Trial]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • November 21, 2019: [Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.