U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01877-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SANTIAGO JEREZ, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 27, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 26, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Suppress]
  • March 24, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.