U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-mj-01970-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHAKEE CLEMMONS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 26, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 26, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.