open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05663
    Party Name:ROGERS v. GILMORE et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of State Court Record]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Record - Prisoner]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Prisoner State Record]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?564873
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =