open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-05667
    Party Name:HALL v. CARING PEOPLE ALLIANCE
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report Of]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?564874
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =