open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01546
    Party Name:BAKEWELL v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Statistical Case Closing]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.pawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?262003
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =