U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00188
  • Case Name: BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Remark]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Final Discipline Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Certified Copy of Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Final Discipline Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Certified Copy of Order]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Final Discipline Order]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Remark]
  • February 10, 2020: [Certified Copy of Order]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Final Discipline Order]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.