U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-02022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IDEHEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Remark]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Arrest]
  • December 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 11, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • December 10, 2019: [Letter to Unseal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.