U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:97-mc-00104
  • Case Name: SOKOLOW, CRAIG B. v.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Response]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Unseal Document]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Final Discipline Order]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Transcript - No PDF]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Discipline]
  • October 20, 2020: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Disbarment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.