U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00191
  • Case Name: HIGH TECH NATIONAL, LLC v. STEAD et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 09, 2020: [Transcript - PDF]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Remark]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Deposit of Funds]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • August 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • August 18, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 31, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 08, 2020: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 02, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 17, 2020: [Memorandum]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • June 02, 2020: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
  • June 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Contempt]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Affidavit]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [Affidavit]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.