U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00205
  • Case Name: SAP AMERICA, INC. v. INSIGHT DIRECT USA, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Case Transferred Out]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [Remark]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Compel]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)]
  • December 20, 2019: [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.