U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00206
  • Case Name: IN RE: THERMAN WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Application/Petition]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Application/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.