U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mc-00217
  • Case Name: MURPHY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Remark]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Final Discipline Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Statement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Transcript - No PDF]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Three-Judge Court Hearing-Discipline]
  • August 16, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • August 16, 2021: [Vacate]
  • August 12, 2021: [Response]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 27, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • July 27, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Response]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 27, 2019: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.