U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AKERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 23, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.