U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00002
  • Case Name: S.R. et al v. PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.