U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURGESS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 23, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 22, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.