U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-mj-01298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERRERA, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2022: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Dismissing Magistrate Case]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Report and Order of Probation]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2020: [Bond]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.