U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEASLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 29, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 03, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 31, 2020: [Arrest]
  • January 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.