U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00004
  • Case Name: NITV FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC v. DEKTOR CORPORATION et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2020: [Request for Default Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Response]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Interrogatories in Attachment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • January 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 30, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • January 30, 2020: [Writ]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.