U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TRUJILLO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 12, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Report and Order of Probation]
  • February 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.