U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00006
  • Case Name: AETNA INC. LITIGATION et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • March 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • February 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Statement]
  • February 07, 2020: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.