U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00191-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOVAN, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Travel]
  • November 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 03, 2020: [Travel]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Report and Order of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • May 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Response]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2020: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 03, 2020: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 27, 2020: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 26, 2020: [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of US Passport]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 26, 2020: [Arrest]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • February 24, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 21, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice of US Passport]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of US Passport]
  • February 12, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 12, 2020: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2020: [Arrest]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.