U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00007
  • Case Name: Warren Hill, LLC v. SFR Equities, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
  • March 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2020: [Clarification]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • February 28, 2020: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • February 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.