open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00830
    Party Name:ECBM, LP v. CHANCE
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Deposit of Funds]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?567746
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =