open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cv-00838
    Party Name:MOORE v. KAUFFMAN et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?567744
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =