U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00413-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOSH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 27, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 18, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • March 05, 2020: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • March 04, 2020: [MAG Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.