U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00438-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Arrest]
  • March 16, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.