U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00394
  • Case Name: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER CONCERNING JURY TRIALS AND CERTAIN OTHER PROCEEDINGS RELATIVE TO COVID-19 MATTERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 02, 2021: [Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extend Time]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 14, 2020: [Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 15, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.