U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00401
  • Case Name: IN RE: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REGARDING COMPUTATION OF TIME FOR FILING OF INFORMATIONS OR INDICTMENTS DUE TO COVID-19 MATTERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 02, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.