U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00413
  • Case Name: I.C.E. SERVICE GROUP, INC. et al v. PACTEC, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order to Vacate Document]
  • September 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • September 11, 2020: [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required)]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2020: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.