U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00470-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALEXANDER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2020: [Arrest]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.