U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00049
  • Case Name: THOMAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 11, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Certified Copy of Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Certified Copy of Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.