U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mc-00050
  • Case Name: SEIZURE OF THREE THOUSAND, FIVE HUNDRED EIGHTY-FIVE DOLLARS ($3,585.00) UNITED STATES CURRENCY SEIZED FROM 335 LAMOKIN STREET, CHESTER PA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.