open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00200-1
    Party Name:USA v. GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., USA
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?572804
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =