open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:20-22286-
    Party Name:Scott A. Reider and Jennifer M. Reider
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [none]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 01, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?369674
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =