open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:20-bk-02387-
    Party Name:Gregory Scott Grabow
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds collected]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Certificate of Financial Management OR Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Employee Income Records (Payment Advices, Pay Stubs, Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 7))]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Employee Income Records (Certification of NO Payment Advices or Pay Stubs or Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records (Certification of NO Payment Advices or Pay Stubs or Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-docket of credit card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conway, (Trustee) Mark J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?269191
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =