open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:20-70405-
    Party Name:Jon L. Plummer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [341 by Telephone]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [none]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?369771
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =